4TH MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE (ST EDMUNDS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1018281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Group are based in Mansfield Woodhouse Nottinghamshire. Activities include camping, hiking and other activities connected with the scouting movement.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,518
Total expenditure: £7,830

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WOODHOUSE SCOUTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Johnson Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Phillip Pogmore Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Richard Cassell Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Sheila Adamson Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Gavin Hammond Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Scott Hammond Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
David Harry Brotherhood Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Thomas Swayne Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Kirsten Evans Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
PETER BROWN Trustee 21 July 2019
None on record
DEAN WALTERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.23k £0 £15.68k £8.11k £5.52k
Total expenditure £9.14k £2.17k £10.60k £7.71k £7.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21, St. Edmunds Avenue
St. Edmunds Avenue
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottinghamshire
NG19 9JX
Phone:
07910725927
Website:

No information available