MARSHFIELD AND COLD ASHTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A group of women who seek to further their education and who contribute to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 08 March 1993: Standard registration
- MARSHFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIAN ROGERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Judy Brason | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Evans | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ratcliffe | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Traynor | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE COLBOURNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRISTINE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN OLIVE PURNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 20/09/2020 | 20/09/2021 | 20/09/2022 | 20/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03k | £1.57k | £742 | £1.26k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £1.67k | £1.59k | £1.19k | £2.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 September 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 September 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MARSHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 FAIRFIELD CLOSE
MARSHFIELD
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 8NH
- Phone:
- 01225891467
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window