TIGRAY DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, health and general welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 05 March 1993: Standard registration
- T D A (Working name)
- TDA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eden Assefa Mamo | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tiegisty Mengesteab Equbaegzi | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teklay Desta Kassa | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shewit Abay Hzkias | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanuel Berhe Araya | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alema Gidey Kahsay | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alemu Abreha Abay | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hailekiros Gebrekidan Abebe | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Selamawit Gidey | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teclay Teweldeberhan | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.89k | £164.86k | £356.34k | £281.68k | £176.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.72k | £114.39k | £310.75k | £173.11k | £209.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/11/1992 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2002 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE TIGRAY REGION OF ETHIOPIA
Area of benefit
IN THE TIGRAY REGION OF ETHIOPIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
TDA HOUSE
211 CLAPHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW9 0QH
- Phone:
- 02079240191
- Email:
- tigray@tda-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window