LONDON TAMIL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Education , Social welfare and community service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janartan Shanmuganathan | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thevaki Mahadevan | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nalayinee Shanthakumar | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Visuvalingam Ananthasayanan | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Subramaniam Sabesan | Trustee | 18 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Senthil Sriharan | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Thirunavukkarasu Thirumaran | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.15k | £106.20k | £56.98k | £31.00k | £65.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.03k | £102.76k | £62.30k | £39.00k | £57.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 24TH OF FEBRUARY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF TAMIL SPEAKING PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN TAMIL LANGUAGE, MUSIC, DANCE,DRAMA,SPEECH AND GENERAL AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (B) TO PROVIDE, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE - TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE WHO NEED THEM BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE FOR WHOM THEY ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED. (C) TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY, SICK OR DISABLED IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
253 East Lane
Wembley
HA0 3NN
- Phone:
- 02089082646
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window