WESTON-ON-THE-GREEN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Weston on the Green WI offers opportunities for all women to enjoy friendship, to learn, to widen their horizons. It exists to give all women the opportunity of working together through the Women's Institute organisation, and of putting into practiice those ideals for which it stands for.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 March 1993: Standard registration
- 08 May 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £3.08k | £2.85k | £3.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | £3.23k | £2.91k | £3.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 12 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 18 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 28 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 28 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WESTON-ON-THE-GREEN AND BLETCHINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window