Financial history RELATE WALSALL

Charity number: 1018385
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £36.14k £68.55k £58.94k £51.33k £78.89k
Total expenditure £45.77k £50.75k £68.48k £69.71k £70.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A