RELATE WALSALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a Counselling Service for people with Relationship Challenges, whether attending as individuals, couples or families (which may include siblings). Provides support in the event of relationship breakdown and or separation/divorce, through the medium of counselling. Provides educational workshops, talks and life skills training in relation to relationship issues, when resourced to do so.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 09 March 1993: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RELATE WALSALL - WALSALL RELATE (Working name)
- RELATE WALSALL MARRIAGE GUIDANCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.14k | £68.55k | £58.94k | £51.33k | £78.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.77k | £50.75k | £68.48k | £69.71k | £70.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 29 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 JANUARY 2004 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS (2) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: (1) INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE; AND (2) WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS (3) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: (1) MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL-BEING; OR (2) INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP (4) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT (5) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (6) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window