Financial history FRIENDS OF YAXLEY COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1018407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.08k £4.28k £4.42k £3.83k £3.25k
Total expenditure £6.92k £1.19k £4.57k £4.10k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A