CRAVEN ARMS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school and childcare for children aged 0 years to 11 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 10 March 1993: Standard registration
- 16 April 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 August 2014: Re-registered
- 21 December 2021: Funds received from 1023315 WISTANSTOW UNDER FIVES
- Craven Arms Childcare & Pre-School (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Lewis | Chair | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jones | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elizabeth Town | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Grindley | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Jones | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Abigail Hirons | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Morgan | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Ann Gripton | Trustee | 20 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Weynberg | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.64k | £82.58k | £82.58k | £136.77k | £160.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.27k | £91.57k | £91.57k | £122.96k | £154.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CRAVEN ARMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Craven Arms Community Centre
Newington Way
CRAVEN ARMS
SY7 9PS
- Phone:
- 01588672337
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window