DAR AL-ISLAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1018530
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1) General public library. 2) Religious festivals & events. 3) General and matremonial advice. 4) Helping elderly peoples with their application forms. 5) Help charities & voluntary bodies with building & open space facilities. 6) Provide general services including interpretation & translations. 7) Free interest crisis loans to community members.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £10,508

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Iraq

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 1993: Standard registration
  • 28 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 28 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1197956 DAR AL-ISLAM CENTRE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £538.81k £373.60k £222.13k £332.49k £0
Total expenditure £519.09k £388.62k £404.16k £2.05m £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £483.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.70k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £53.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £519.09k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £142.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window