FIRST HELSBY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of the Scout Association's 'Balanced Programme' to young people in the Helsby area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 10 March 1993: Standard registration
- 1ST HELSBY SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Savage | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Tiplady | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ellams | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dilley | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Ellams | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Berrie | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David King | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
James Bainbridge | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Doran | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH POTTS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.02k | £45.69k | £30.11k | £20.96k | £26.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.16k | £18.35k | £22.72k | £25.18k | £33.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.37k | £16.91k | £2.67k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Helsby Scout Headquarters
Lower Robin Hood Lane
Helsby
Cheshire
WA6 0BW
- Phone:
- 01928725501
- Email:
- chair@1sthelsbyscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window