SOLVA WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We set-out to educate/train,extend our knowledge of arts/culture,sport/recreation, care for environment/conservation,to provide fellowship and help the general public and mankind
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 12 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY HAUGHTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kathryn Davies | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jones | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE WELLS | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary McMahon | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan King | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE PASCOE | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JUNE HIGGINS | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.24k | £698 | £2.57k | £2.05k | £653 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £902 | £3.61k | £2.57k | £1.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDCROFT
SOLVA
HAVERFORDWEST
SA62 6TL
- Phone:
- 01437720744
- Email:
- janekwells@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window