Accounts and annual returns GOSFORTH EAST MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1018541
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 22 October 2008 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required