DOYNTON AND WICK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
W I is for fun& friendship for it's members&to educate&enjoy group activities.It also supports ACWW.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 March 1993: Standard registration
- 17 March 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £1.86k | £2.31k | £2.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82k | £1.85k | £1.92k | £2.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 05 August 2008 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 16 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 07 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 20 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DOYNTON AND WICK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window