FAITH HOPE CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Spain
Governance
- 10 March 1993: Standard registration
- 18 January 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE MINISTRY (Working name)
- HELPING HAND MISSION (Previous name)
- THE FULL GOSPEL FELLOWSHIP OF CHURCHES AND MINISTERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 10 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 28 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED 5 DECEMBER 1994 AND 25 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL AND/OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES (2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ANY PARTS OF THE WORLD AND TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANITY BY MEANS OF BIBLE CLASSES OR OTHERWISE,THE TENETS OF CHRISTIANS BEING ATTACHED HERETO
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window