THE WEST GRIMSBY (3RD & 8TH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities, including camping, badgework, games, arts and crafts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 March 1993: Standard registration
- 3RD GRIMSBY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Geoff Rowe | Chair | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Major | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Marie Gibbons | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacque Taylor-Vine | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy-Anne Foster | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy French | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Mawer | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stephen Bown | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Roy John Downs | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie-Marie Bown | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.83k | £24.74k | £22.50k | £17.72k | £13.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.61k | £8.55k | £14.73k | £18.98k | £16.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Wingate Road
GRIMSBY
DN37 9DU
- Phone:
- 07919 366049
- Email:
- gsl@westgrimsby.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window