MEADS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training Arts/Culture Sport/Recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 19 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS J BAXTER | Chair | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dowling | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Wicks | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann French | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS B JORDAN | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS A SHAW | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS S SCRIVEN | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2018 | 05/09/2019 | 05/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.46k | £3.23k | £2.11k | £552 | £1.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.09k | £2.91k | £1.66k | £720 | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2019 | 15 September 2020 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MEADS,EASTBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Victoria Drive
Eastbourne
BN20 8LA
- Phone:
- 07799550280
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window