STOKE PRIOR AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
W.I. Branch covering Stoke Prior and surrounding rural area. Activities include a monthly meeting on the second Tuesday of the month at 2.30 p.m. and usually include a talk or demonstration, tea and social time. Our Branch will be celebrating its 80th Birthday next year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 11 March 1993: Standard registration
- 02 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- STOKE PRIOR AND DISTRICT WI (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85k | £2.35k | £2.52k | £1.44k | £1.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.94k | £1.99k | £2.21k | £1.33k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 10 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 15 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 19 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 20 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 13 September 2005 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window