NEWCHURCH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of women who meet once a month for the evening. We have a visit from different speakers who educate us on various subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 12 March 1993: Standard registration
- NEWCHURCH WI (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN MARGARET COLBOURN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA Wimble | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Denby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROMA BIGGIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVINENNE PEEBLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LESLEY BEECHING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £1.47k | £767 | £3.24k | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £1.01k | £798 | £2.79k | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NEWCHURCH, NEW ROMNEY, DYMCHURCH AND ALDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACK BULL HOUSE
NEWCHURCH
ROMNEY MARSH
TN29 0DZ
- Phone:
- 01303872235
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window