I M GROUP CHARITABLE DISCRETIONARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants in cases of hardship to U.K. based current and ex-employees of I.M.Group Ltd.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Kent
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWIN WHITFIELD SWATMAN | Chair | 15 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Bayley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KERRY SAMANTHA AMORY | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Carol Griffin | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
DARREN JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £2.17k | £1.68k | £2.12k | £6.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.37k | £19.90k | £20.11k | £19.95k | £16.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AMONG EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED PAGE 5)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
IM Group Ltd
Ryder Street
WEST BROMWICH
West Midlands
B70 0EJ
- Phone:
- 01217474000
- Email:
- lgriffin@imgroup.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window