MESSAGE CHRISTIAN TELEPHONE SERVICE (BRENTWOOD)
Charity number: 1018735
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 March 1993: Standard registration
- 16 January 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 16 January 2007: Funds transferred to 299128 UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other names:
- BRENTWOOD MESSAGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 MARCH 1992, AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 1992.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE TELEPHONE, PRIMARILY (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN THE DISTRICT OF BRENTWOOD IN ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRENTWOOD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window