HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide hall hire to a wide variety of groups/organisations. Our hall has a community fridge and there are many events run by our volunteers for the people of Highfield to become involved in: cash/prize bingo, psychic evenings, table top sales and our santa's grotto is not to be missed, we start the New Year with a family favourite - Panto!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 March 1993: Standard registration
- HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Stopps | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Cole | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Delaney | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Hamm | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joely Fletcher | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stuart | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Koobi | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sammy Barry-Mears | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Link | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Cole | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margret Gogin | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.76k | £28.12k | £28.12k | £33.10k | £54.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.88k | £11.93k | £13.30k | £18.49k | £46.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2024 | 521 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2024 | 521 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2023 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
03 October 2023 | 610 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 May 2023 | 836 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
17 May 2023 | 836 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/07/1991 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2011
Charitable objects
A) TO ENHANCE THE HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WHEREVER THE NEEDS ARISE AND BY SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING THE HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL ITS RESIDENTS. B) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE TO ENSURE IT IS BEING USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AREA AND IS A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT FOR ALL VISITORS AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
HIGHFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highfield Community Association
Community Centre
Bellgate
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP2 5SB
- Phone:
- 01442 211688
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window