Financial history ST BARBE MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY

Charity number: 1018779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £301.06k £345.63k £491.98k £347.36k £478.15k
Total expenditure £431.35k £359.07k £479.97k £450.21k £563.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.69k N/A £315.91k £110.68k £223.03k