POOLE OLD TOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of the inhabitants of Poole Old Town. To provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for the recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the condition of life for the said inhabitants. To provide social and well being activities for the inhabitants of the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 15 March 1993: Standard registration
- POOLE OLD TOWN COMM ASSOC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON RICKETTS-PARKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ZOE LAMBERT | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Sullivan | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WASS | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jolly | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Court | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen White | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Warwick | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAN SAUNDERS | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN VERCRUCYE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNY CULL | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.22k | £13.71k | £28.10k | £17.46k | £18.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.87k | £16.64k | £23.02k | £15.96k | £18.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH JUNE 1992, AMENDED 15TH NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF POOLE OLD TOWN WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THOSE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
POOLE, DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 LAGLAND STREET
POOLE
BH15 1RR
- Phone:
- 01202660058
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window