Trustees POOLE OLD TOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1018780

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON RICKETTS-PARKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ZOE LAMBERT | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Sullivan | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WASS | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jolly | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Court | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen White | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Warwick | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAN SAUNDERS | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN VERCRUCYE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNY CULL | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.