DARBARI TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An educational charity-Disseminating generally the message of GOODNESS to schools,places of work,FIVE of its core principles: BE A GOOD CITIZEN. BE GOOD TO YOURSELF. BE GOOD TO YOUR FAMILY.BE A GIVER RATHER THAN A TAKER. DO GOOD WHEREVER YOU GO. From a sense of morality, we all need to be Good Citizens of the UK. What we all enjoy in the UK is only a distant dream in many other parts of the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 April 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARBARI RACHHPAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PUSHPINDER KAUR BEDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/04/2019 | 13/04/2020 | 13/04/2021 | 13/04/2022 | 13/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £3.90k | £23.30k | £2.54k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.76k | £8.29k | £9.95k | £13.13k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days | |
Annual return | 13 April 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 422 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 April 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 13 April 2020 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
1.PROMOTION,PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF BASIC SIKHISM AS PROPOUNDED BY THE FOUNDER SAT GURU NANAK,AND IN PARTICULAR THE DISSEMINATION OF THE TEACHINGS OF THE DARBARI PRINCIPLES.2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY AND 3.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAYA HOUSE
KESAR SINGH RAI BUILDINGS
43 SPRING GROVE ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW3 4BD
- Phone:
- 02085720044
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window