Financial history GLEBE HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LTD

Charity Number: 1018815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.21m £1.57m £1.83m £2.03m £2.54m
Total expenditure £1.46m £1.53m £1.84m £2.30m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £105.74k £440.20k £494.64k £468.97k £557.90k
Income from government grants N/A £246.98k £107.03k £27.58k £1.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £44.12k £22.33k £37.10k £14.19k £337.36k
Income - Other trading activities £25.61k £6.55k £22.90k £35.07k £50.55k
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.30m £1.66m £1.96m £2.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2 £1 £0 £0 £203
Income - Other £104 £246.98k £112.03k £27.58k £1.00k
Income - Legacies £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.53m £1.84m £2.30m £2.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £29.86k £20.89k £43.80k £30.55k £61.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0