Tunbridge Wells u3a

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tunbridge Wells U3A is a recreational and educational organisation set up with the aim of benefiting those in the community who are retired or no longer in full-time gainful employment. It provides a meeting each month with an invited speaker, a variety of social gatherings and has over sixty study groups with subjects from art appreciation to 10 mile walks. Around 150 attend the monthly meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 16 March 1993: Standard registration
- T W U 3 A (Working name)
- TUNBRIDGE WELLS UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Duckett | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN WOODWARD | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nesta Ethel Sian Shaw | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Bernstein | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Horwood | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Findlay | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Hasell | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Sands | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Young | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.49k | £23.52k | £41.98k | £44.98k | £45.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.25k | £19.24k | £38.72k | £41.48k | £42.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 14 Feb 2021 as amended on 15 Apr 2021 as amended on 21 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SILVER BIRCHES
31 BRIAN CRESCENT
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
KENT
TN4 0AN
- Phone:
- 07835300193
- Email:
- secretarytwu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window