BONE RESEARCH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bone Research Society is a charitable organisation that brings together scientists, clinicians and other parties who have an interest in research into the causes, developments and treatments of diseases of the mineralised tissues of the body. The prediminant focus of the Society is bone disease and osteoporosis is the most prevalent of those.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 1993: Standard registration
- BRS (Working name)
- BONE AND TOOTH SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Karan Mehul Shah | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Lucie Bourne | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Judith Sarah Bubbear | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Rebecca Elizabeth Andrews | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof John Howard Duncan Bassett | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr GUDRUN STENBECK | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Scott Roberts | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Edwards | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Celia Gregson | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Stephen | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Shere | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Alison Gartland | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Curtis | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.14k | £20.56k | £73.27k | £105.85k | £82.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.64k | £47.31k | £42.72k | £103.65k | £105.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE SCIENCE OF CALCIFIED TISSUES AND RELATED SUBJECTS (B) TO UNDERTAKE STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE SCIENCE OF CALCIFIED TISSUES AND RELATED AREAS AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saffery Champness Llp
Westpoint
Peterborough Business Park
Lynch Wood
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 6FZ
- Phone:
- 02920743135
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window