Financial history FRIENDS OF BISHOP LOVEDAY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1018847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.45k £10.93k £9.40k £8.81k £8.95k
Total expenditure £13.52k £8.55k £4.03k £8.65k £10.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £500 N/A N/A N/A