Governing document RELATE (MILTON KEYNES)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/2014 as amended on 24 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIP, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS AND MARRIAGE AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC; C) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE AND WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP, AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MILTON KEYNES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.