ST WILLIAMS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to enhance the education of our children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Emmerson | Chair | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE COLVIN | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Julie Dawson | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Berry | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Elizabeth Adcock | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Saggers | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.42k | £10.04k | £14.76k | £9.62k | £14.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.91k | £2.60k | £786 | £1.94k | £4.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/1992 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Williams Primary School
Williams Loke
St. Williams Way
NORWICH
NR7 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01603701098
- Email:
- thorpeswa@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window