SUDDEN PRODUCTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community work, stage plays, short films and other educational projects with young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £26,140 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
Governance
- 17 March 1993: Standard registration
- DEEP IMPACT THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
- YOUTH THEATRE IN ARTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL HALLETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN BRADBURY | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BRUETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.35k | £34.02k | £49.13k | £113.87k | £130.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.84k | £33.35k | £51.70k | £90.66k | £149.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | £26.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 28 JULY 1999, 12 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
A.PROMOTE,IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF DRAMA IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION IN PUBLIC OF PLAYS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.B.TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WAREHOUSE
54-57 ALLISON STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B5 5TH
- Phone:
- 07778335214
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window