Financial history SHAHJALAL JAME MASJID-E-NOOR AND MADRASHA AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity Number: 1018891
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £61.45k £58.06k £84.78k £87.34k £79.20k
Total expenditure £57.52k £55.17k £55.08k £69.60k £61.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.66k £25.23k N/A N/A