Financial history MAESTEG COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1018928
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Total gross income £500 £500 £550 £672 £212
Total expenditure £300 £300 £295 £662 £596
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A