Financial history HYNDBURN LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1018956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.27k £2.34k £3.67k £4.04k £3.78k
Total expenditure £2.65k £207 £641 £903 £744
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A