THE ADOLESCENT AND CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TACT IS A DIVERSIFIED CHILDREN'S CHARITY PREDOMINANTLY PROVIDING FOSTERING, ADOPTION AND PERMANENCY FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PUBLIC CARE OR ON THE CUSP OF CARE. THE CHARITY ALSO CAMPAIGNS AND ADVOCATES ON BEHALF OF LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£26,378,000
Donations and legacies | £6.00k | |
Charitable activities | £26.16m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £213.00k | |
Other | £3.00k |
Total expenditure:
£25,204,000
Raising funds | £78.00k | |
Charitable activities | £25.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£213,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £25,960,000 from 542 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £78.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.13m | |
Retained for future use | £1.17m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £78.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.13m | |
Retained for future use | £1.39m |
People

204 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 13 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 March 1993: Standard registration
- TACT (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Lorraine Johnstone | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Penney | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francisco Yeo | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chizoma Okaro | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WOODMAN | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Tom Bingham | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer O'Connell | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anderson | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Scott | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.39m | £25.60m | £25.44m | £26.32m | £26.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.16m | £23.91m | £24.24m | £24.37m | £25.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.90m | £25.53m | £25.38m | £25.87m | £25.96m | |
|
Income from government grants | £270.00k | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.00k | £139.00k | £7.00k | £11.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £30.22m | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £144.00k | £25.39m | £0 | £26.06m | £26.16m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £58.00k | £213.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £68.00k | £51.00k | £190.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £30.08m | £23.82m | £24.14m | £24.27m | £25.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £81.00k | £91.00k | £98.00k | £100.00k | £78.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £157.00k | £4.83m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £559.00k | £525.00k | £511.00k | £216.00k | £150.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £6.30m | £7.98m | £9.30m | £11.52m | £11.67m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.68m | £3.64m | £3.74m | £3.72m | £2.63m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8 SEPTEMBER 2003, 27 JULY 2005, 27 JUNE 2007 AND 27 NOVEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JAN 2018 as amended on 18 Dec 2023 as amended on 19 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF FOSTER, ADOPTIVE OR SUBSTITUTE CARE BY PLACING CHILDREN IN FOSTER HOMES OR ADOPTIVE PLACEMENTS AND BY TRAINING FOSTER OR ADOPTIVE PARENTS TO DEAL WITH THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN IN THEIR CARE; (2) OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND UPBRINGING AND ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE OF CHILDREN IN NEED THEREOF INCLUDING BY PROMOTION OF THEIR HEALTH, DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN IN FOSTER OR ADOPTIVE CARE; AND (3) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF CHILDREN IN CARE, PUBLIC POLICY ON CARE AND THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN ENTERING THE CARE SYSTEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tact Care
PO Box 137
BLYTH
Northumberland
NE24 9FJ
- Phone:
- 02086958135
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window