ADDISON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School Education, childcare and focus activities for children aged 2 to 5. This Charity is linked to Addison Pre-School Ltd, Charity number 1142314, which was incorporated to take over from this un-incorporated Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 22 March 1993: Standard registration
- 04 February 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 February 2014: Funds transferred to 1142314 BROOK GREEN NURSERY LTD
- ADDISON PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.12k | £155.32k | £86.33k | £48.22k | £34.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.07k | £69.83k | £149.23k | £65.26k | £14.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 22 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 22 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 20 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 29 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 22 October 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDERN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IN THE HAMMERSMITH AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window