Financial history TANDRIDGE ACCESS GROUP

Charity number: 1019082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13 £63 £53 £52 £13.47k
Total expenditure £32 £0 £0 £273 £13.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A