INTERNATIONAL DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY OF KUNSELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, advance and maintain the Dzogchen teachings and practise in its Buddhist and other forms throughtout the UK. To promote greeater understanding of Tibetan culture and traditions according to the teachings and spiritual guidance of Namkhai Rinpoche and his nominated sucerssors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 1993: Standard registration
- DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY U.K. (Working name)
- DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY UK (Working name)
- DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- THE DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louis Oliver Vaughan | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Pond | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajan Darbar | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Russell | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolus Johannes Jacobus Maria Van Oldenbeek | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Beeston | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rafal Radecki | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.53k | £61.51k | £68.41k | £83.19k | £93.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.91k | £66.45k | £66.85k | £77.08k | £75.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 2 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE DZOGCHEN TEACHING AND PRACTICE IN ITS BUDDHIST AND BON FORMS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROMOTE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF ALL TIBETAN CULTURE AND TRADITIONS ACCORDING TO THE TEACHING AND SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF NAMKHAI NORBU RINPOCHE AND HIS NOMINATED SUCCESSORS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Polygon Road
BRISTOL
BS8 4PA
- Phone:
- 01179349435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window