Governing document INTERNATIONAL DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY OF KUNSELLING

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 2 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE DZOGCHEN TEACHING AND PRACTICE IN ITS BUDDHIST AND BON FORMS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROMOTE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF ALL TIBETAN CULTURE AND TRADITIONS ACCORDING TO THE TEACHING AND SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF NAMKHAI NORBU RINPOCHE AND HIS NOMINATED SUCCESSORS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.