Trustees INTERNATIONAL DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY OF KUNSELLING
Charity Number: 1019101

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louis Oliver Vaughan | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Pond | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajan Darbar | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Russell | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolus Johannes Jacobus Maria Van Oldenbeek | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Beeston | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rafal Radecki | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.