Financial history SUTTON CENTRE UNDER 5S PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1019154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £82.11k £77.68k £53.72k £85.21k £91.77k
Total expenditure £94.80k £82.49k £75.90k £84.00k £89.86k
Income from government contracts N/A £75.04k £49.53k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.51k £1.03k N/A N/A N/A