Financial history HICKLING PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1019172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.89k £23.11k £45.30k £63.34k £63.98k
Total expenditure £33.30k £29.94k £42.38k £50.96k £55.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A