Financial history LEATHERHEAD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1019222
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £3.06k £3.61k £4.57k £4.24k £4.57k
Total expenditure £3.11k £3.33k £4.06k £3.93k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A