YEOFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is regularly used by Sweetpeas playgroup, Yeoford Primary School, Yeoford Yarns (a sewing group), an art class and fitness classes. The hall hosts regular fundraising events for community projects, including Beer Festivals, Art Exhibitions, Christmas Fairs etc, and is also available for hire by the community for parties, rehearsal space, or other events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1000 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 30 March 1993: Standard registration
- 06 November 2012: Funds received from 1109187 THE YEOFORD RECREATION GROUND TRUST
- YEOFORD VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niki Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Drake | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Price | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Wholey | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gilliver | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Delia Hawkins | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edna Beasley | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Stevens | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE LUCKING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Morwenna Rogers | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.00k | £36.60k | £39.17k | £23.79k | £27.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.02k | £15.73k | £27.68k | £20.58k | £22.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.07k | N/A | £8.21k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
YEOFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
TORRIDON
STATION ROAD
YEOFORD
CREDITON
EX17 5HZ
- Phone:
- 01363 84501
- Email:
- yeoford.hall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window