Trustees YEOFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1019279

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niki Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Drake | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Price | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Wholey | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gilliver | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Delia Hawkins | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edna Beasley | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Stevens | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE LUCKING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Morwenna Rogers | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.