BLYTH VALLEY CHAMBER MUSIC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OBJECT The object of the Society shall be to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of chamber music in all its aspects by the presentation of professional public concerts and by such other ways as the Society through its Committee shall determine from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 March 1993: Standard registration
- 06 October 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1169617 CONCERTS AT CRATFIELD CIO
- CONCERTS AT CRATFIELD (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.49k | £29.96k | £2.01k | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.26k | £27.16k | £705 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 15 January 2020 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 12 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHAMBER MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PROFESSIONAL PUBLIC CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window