FRIENDS OF WALLACE KENNELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to raise funds to relieve the suffering and distress of animals (in particular dogs) which are in need of care and attention by reason of ill treatment, abandonment, injury or sickness. The ultimate aim is the rehoming of dogs whenever possible through the rescue centre of Wallace Kennels.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 29 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Duniam | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bartrop | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Fairbairn | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bell | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Bolton | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Littlechild | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Evans | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Rudy | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
TERESA BARTHOLOMEW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.86k | £15.37k | £40.10k | £35.82k | £22.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.92k | £47.78k | £51.38k | £59.23k | £62.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN JUNE 1990, AMENDED JULY 1992, 12 FEBRUARY 1993 AND 11 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS (IN PARTICULAR DOGS) WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF ILL-TREATMENT, ABANDONMENT, INJURY OR SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE MOST OF ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Wallace Kennels
Clapgate
Chivers Road
Stondon Massey
Brentwood
CM15 0LH
- Phone:
- 01277554459
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window