HAMWORTHY MONEY ADVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice and guidance on procedures for people (mainly but not exclusively in the 'sub-prime' category) in the Hamworthy (including Turlin Moor) district of Poole with debt problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 29 March 1993: Standard registration
- 14 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HAMWORTHY ADVICE (Working name)
- HAMWORTHY MONEY ADVICE PROJECT (Working name)
- TURLIN MOOR MONEY ADVICE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.75k | £48.60k | £54.95k | £21.44k | £15.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.62k | £37.90k | £40.15k | £36.00k | £39.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 11 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 11 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/08/1992 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/1993 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/1994 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/12/2015 AS AMENDED ON 02 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND POVERTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF HAMWORTHY AND RESIDENTS OF OTHER PARISHES OF POOLE.
Area of benefit
TURLIN MOOR AND OTHER PARTS OF THE PARISH OF HAMWORTHY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window